Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Julia E Kobick
Case #: 1:25-cv-11037
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 9:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Pamela Jo Bondi
Defendant
Mr. Todd Lyons
Immigration and Customs Enforcement Acting Boston Field Office Director 1000 District Avenue
Burlington, MA 01803
Defendant
Governor Kristi Noem South Dakota
Plaintiff
Student Doe


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 04/28 8:19 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing - This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the [LINK:Court schedule] . In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact the session [LINK:here] . Status Conference set for 5/13/2025 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 ( Remote only ) before District Judge Julia E. Kobick. (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 04/28 8:18 AM
District Judge Julia E. Kobick: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The plaintiff's motion to withdraw his motion for a temporary restraining order without prejudice, ECF 14 , is GRANTED . In light of the withdrawal of the motion for a temporary restraining order, the hearing on April 29, 2025, is cancelled. A remote status conference will be held on May 13, 2025, at 2:30 p.m. (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/25 3:57 PM
MOTION MOTION TO HOLD IN ABEYANCE re3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Student Doe.(Hurvich, Carl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
13 13 misc Letter/request - non-motion Thu 04/24 7:06 PM
Letter/request (non-motion) from Counsel for Plaintiff . (Hurvich, Carl)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/24 12:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Sauter on behalf of Kristi Noem, Todd Lyons, Pamela Jo Bondi (Sauter, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
11 11 notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Wed 04/23 8:43 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2025 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (In person only) before District Judge Julia E. Kobick. (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/23 8:42 AM
District Judge Julia E. Kobick: ORDER entered. Please see attached. The Court hereby orders as follows: 1. Defendants Noem, Lyons, and Bondi, and any agents acting under their authority or control, are temporarily restrained (a) from arresting or detaining plaintiff Doe, under 8 U.S.C. § 1226(a), or otherwise for being unlawfully present in the United States without legal permission or authority, based on the termination his F-1 student status in SEVIS, or (b) if Doe has already been arrested or detained, transferring him outside the District of Massachusetts, until 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, April 30, 2025. This order is subject to such further extension by the Court as may be appropriate. 2. This order is issued without notice to the United States because there are specific facts set out in the affidavits and pleadings that clearly show that immediate and irreparable injury, loss, or damage will result to plaintiff Doe before the United States can be heard in opposition. 3. Having already initiated service of the complaint and summons on the defendants on April 21, 2025, ECF 8 , plaintiff Doe is ordered to also serve a copy of this order and his motion for a temporary restraining order, memorandum in support of that motion, and all related filings on the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts, and to complete service in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i)(2), by 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, April 24, 2025. 4. The defendants shall file any opposition or response to the motion for a temporary restraining order by the close of business on Monday, April 28, 2025. 5. A hearing shall be held on Tuesday, April 29, 2025, at 1:00 p.m., in Courtroom 3. SO ORDERED. (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
9 9 order General Order 19-02 Tue 04/22 7:06 AM
General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Mon 04/21 7:05 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Student Doe. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by Student Doe.(Hurvich, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 04/21 10:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Pamela Jo Bondi, Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (SR)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Case Assignment Mon 04/21 10:10 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Julia E. Kobick assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (JAM)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Memorandum of Law Mon 04/21 9:32 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Student Doe. (SR)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice for Social Security Cases Mon 04/21 9:26 AM
Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (SR)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 04/21 9:19 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Student Doe.(Hurvich, Carl) Modified on 4/21/2025 to edit docket text (SR). Modified on 4/21/2025 (SR)
Related: [-]
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit B,
Att: 6 Exhibit C,
Att: 7 Exhibit D,
Att: 8 Exhibit E,
Att: 9 Exhibit F,
Att: 10 Exhibit G
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/21 9:12 AM
MOTION Proceed Pseudonymously by Student Doe.(Hurvich, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/21 9:05 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10962473 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Student Doe.(Hurvich, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Category Form,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet