Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Aileen M Cannon
Case #: 9:25-cv-80486
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 10:05 AM EDT
Defendant
8188 JOG RD LLC
Plaintiff
Eric Rogers
Represented By
Alberto R. Leal
Alberto R. Leal, Esq., P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
14 14 motion Extension of Time Thu 05/15 2:53 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by 8188 JOG RD LLC. Responses due by 5/29/2025. (Lewis, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
13 13 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 05/13 8:36 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER striking11 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint1 remains May 15, 20256 . Any request to extend this deadline must come in the form of a properly filed motion following meaningful conferral. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 5/13/2025. (jco)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
12 12 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Mon 05/12 4:14 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the email information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney Timothy Philip Lewis re8 Notice of Attorney Appearance (pt)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Stipulation Mon 05/12 2:47 PM
STIPULATION Extend Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by 8188 JOG RD LLC (Lewis, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
10 10 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Tue 05/06 1:00 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney Timothy Philip Lewis re8 Notice of Attorney Appearance (pt)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Tue 05/06 10:16 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Timothy Philip Lewis re7 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Timothy Philip Lewis has not completed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. After filing something in any pending cases, Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions.[LINK:www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information] (pt)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 05/05 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Philip Lewis on behalf of 8188 JOG RD LLC (Lewis, Timothy)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of CHANGE OF ADDRESS, Email or Law Firm Name Mon 05/05 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information; Change of Email; Change of Law Firm Name; Main Phone Number. by Timothy Philip Lewis (Lewis, Timothy)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 05/05 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Philip Lewis on behalf of 8188 JOG RD LLC. Attorney Timothy Philip Lewis added to party 8188 JOG RD LLC(pty:dft). (Lewis, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 04/24 5:21 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eric Rogers. 8188 JOG RD LLC served on 4/24/2025, response/answer due 5/15/2025. (Leal, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
4 4 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 04/21 9:43 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES ON SEALING/REDACTION: Notwithstanding the requirements of Local Rule 5.4 and/or any protective order, the parties are prohibited from filing anything under seal or from redacting any content from a court filing or exhibit/attachment (except for the personal data identifiers listed in Section 6A of this District's CM/ECF Administrative Procedures) unless the party with a stated interest in sealing/redaction first seeks and obtains permission from the Court via a motion for leave. The motion for leave must be filed after meaningful conferral with the opposing party (or parties) and be filed publicly except as authorized by prior Court order. Additionally, the motion for leave shall specify the particularized basis for sealing the proposed material; shall describe the information/documents to be sealed with as much specificity as possible but without attaching the proposed sealed material; shall indicate the proposed duration of the seal request and the reasons why means other than sealing are unavailable or unsatisfactory; shall contain a separate certificate of conference section indicating the results of the parties' meaningful conferral; and shall be filed at last three business days before any related deadline to permit adequate Court consideration. The party seeking authorization to seal material shall not file or otherwise attach the subject material until the Court has ruled on the motion for leave. Finally, all parties are advised that mere designation of material as confidential and/or otherwise subject to a protective order does not bind the Court, does not supplant the requirements of the Local Rules on sealing, and does not otherwise relieve the party seeking sealing/redaction from justifying its request under applicable legal principals governing the presumption of public access to civil proceedings. Failure to comply with this Notice may result in immediate unsealing of any unauthorized shielded material. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/21/2025. (jco)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 04/21 11:21 AM
Summons Issued as to 8188 JOG RD LLC. (ar24)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 04/21 11:19 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/21 9:53 AM
COMPLAINT against 8188 JOG RD LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18382777, filed by Eric Rogers.(Leal, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet