Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Clay D Land
Case #: 4:25-cv-00130
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:1338 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 11:06 AM EDT
Defendant
WEBMD LLC
Plaintiff
DOCTOR AI LLC


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/22 2:09 PM
ORDER setting deadline by which counsel must enter an appearance. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 4/22/2025. (esl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 04/21 11:53 AM
Summons issued as to WEBMD, LLC (tlf)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/21 11:38 AM
COMPLAINT filed by DOCTOR AI, LLC against WEBMD LLC. Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number 43631 (tlf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Index,
Att: 3 Case Timeline,
Att: 4 Explanation for Self-Representation and Jurisdiction,
Att: 5 Jurisdiction Rationale,
Att: 6 Exhibit 1 - E-mail,
Att: 7 Exhibit 2 - E-mail,
Att: 8 Exhibit 3 - DM Exchange,
Att: 9 Exhibit 4 - DM Exchage,
Att: 10 Exhibit 5 - DM Exchange,
Att: 11 Exhibit 6 - Notice of WebMD sale,
Att: 12 Exhibit 7 - Patent US 11,972,865 Bl,
Att: 13 Exhibit 8 - Intellectual Property Agreement,
Att: 14 Exhibit 9 - February 2025 Calendar,
Att: 15 Exhibit 1- March 2025 Calendar,
Att: 16 Exhibit 11 - April 2025 Calendar,
Att: 17 Exhibit 12 - Claim Chart Analysis,
Att: 18 Exhibit 13 - Narrative of Copyright Ownership