Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeremy D Kernodle
Referred: John D Love
Case #: 4:25-cv-00403
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 11:08 AM CDT
Defendant
Sean Koppels
Defendant
Judge Lindsey Wynne
Defendant
Brandi Underwood
Defendant
Texas Health and Human Services Commission
Defendant
Texas Department of Family And Protective Services
Defendant
Latrisha Spencer
Defendant
Megan Miller
Defendant
Corie McDonald
Defendant
Kaci Koslan
Defendant
Loretta Keller
Defendant
Marc Johnson
Defendant
Kaily Haritos
Defendant
Alyson Dietrich
Defendant
Crystal Cato
Defendant
Jennifer Castleman
Defendant
Robin Benton
Plaintiff
Traci Springs
P.O. Box 12108
Austin, TX 78711


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
11 11 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 04/25 3:30 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of United States Magistrate Judge. The court RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's motions for injunctive relief (Doc. Nos.2 ,8 ) be DENIED and that Plaintiff's claims for declaratory and injunctive relief beDISMISSED without prejudice as barred by the Younger abstention doctrine. Objections due within 14 days of receipt. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/25/2025. (CLC)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 04/25 11:05 AM
ORDER re2 MOTION to Seal Document1 Complaint, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Traci Springs, Motions terminated:2 MOTION to Seal Document1 Complaint, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Traci Springs. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/25/2025. (CLC)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Electronically Fri 04/25 10:54 AM
ORDER denying7 Motion for Leave to File Electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/25/2025. (CLC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/24 1:11 PM
Emergency MOTION to Stay State Proceedings Pending Federal Review by Traci Springs.(rpc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
7 7 motion Leave to File Electronically Thu 04/24 12:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Electronically by Traci Springs. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 9 pgs order Order Wed 04/23 10:53 AM
ORDER TO AMEND. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff file an amended complaint addressing the deficiencies discussed above and consistent with Rule 8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within thirty (30) days from receipt of this order. Moreover, to the extent that Plaintiff intends to bring claims on behalf of her children, she may also use this time to find a lawyer to file her amended complaint. Failure to timely comply with this order may result in dismissal of this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/23/2025. (CLC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/21 10:55 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Traci Springs. (CLC)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Non-Pris Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Mon 04/21 10:54 AM
Non-prisoner pro se consent to receive electronic notice filed by Traci Springs. (CLC)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 04/21 10:53 AM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Request for Injunctive Relief by Traci Springs.(CLC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Letter
2 2 motion Seal Document Temporary Restraining Order Mon 04/21 10:50 AM
EMERGENCY MOTION to Seal Confidential Exhibits in Support of Complaint and Temporary Restraining Order by Traci Springs. (CLC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/21 10:46 AM
COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights Under 42 U.S.C. §§ 1983, 1985 against All Defendants, filed by Traci Springs.(CLC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 04/21 10:56 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (CLC)
Related: [-]