Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Clay D Land
Referred: Amelia G Helmick
Case #: 4:25-cv-00131
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Terminated:Apr 22, 2025
Petitioner
JAMES M MARTIN
Respondent
MARK AGBAOSI

GPO Apr 22 2025
ORDER ORDER DISMISSING CASE as to 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 4/22/2025 (tlf).

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 order Judgment Tue 04/22 3:47 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing case (tlf)
Related: [-]
4 4 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case/Dismissing as Frivolous Tue 04/22 3:45 PM
ORDER ORDER DISMISSING CASE as to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 4/22/2025 (tlf)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 04/21 2:07 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Helmick issued at the direction of the Court (tlf)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/21 2:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by JAMES M. MARTIN. Motion referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Amelia G. Helmick (tlf)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Mon 04/21 1:55 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by JAMES M. MARTIN (tlf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit - James Martin,
Att: 2 Grounds,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - State Court Transcript,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Georgia Supreme Court Decision,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - State Court Notice,
Att: 6 Envelope