Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:R Stan Baker
Referred: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Case #: 6:25-cv-00031
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Terminated:Apr 22, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/22 3:53 PM
ORDER transfering the1 Complaint filed by Kemmit L. Preston to the Columbus Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 4/22/25. (wwp)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Tue 04/22 4:00 PM
Case transferred to District of Middle Georgia. File Transferred Electronically. (wwp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
4 4 3 pgs order Order re Magistrate Assignment Mon 04/21 11:59 AM
ORDER re Magistrate Assignment. Plaintiff Statement Re Assignment Due on 5/5/2025. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 04/21/2025. (Attachment: #1 Party's Statement Form.) (jlh)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Inmate Account Statement Mon 04/21 11:52 AM
Inmate Account Statement by Kemmit L. Preston. (jlh)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/21 11:51 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Kemmit L. Preston. Responses due by 5/5/2025. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (jlh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/21 11:49 AM
COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Kemmit L. Preston. (jlh)
Related: [-]