Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:Dudley H Bowen
Referred: Brian K Epps
Case #: 3:25-cv-00045
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/22 3:09 PM
ORDER: Objections to this4 Report and Recommendation must be filed by no later than 5/9/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/22/2025. (amd)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 04/22 3:08 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge recommending the denial of Plaintiff's2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing this action without prejudice. (Objections to R&R due by 5/9/2025.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/22/2025. (amd) (amd). Modified on 4/22/2025 to upload correct document (amd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/22/2025) Report and Recommendation
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 misc Inmate Account Statement Mon 04/21 11:17 AM
Inmate Account Statement by Earnest Barnard Clayton. (wwp)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/21 11:16 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Earnest Barnard Clayton. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(wwp)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/21 11:15 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Earnest Barnard Clayton.(wwp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit