New York Southern District Court
Judge:Philip M Halpern
Case #: 7:25-cv-03276
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Case in other court:USBC-SDNY, 24-09028

Debtor
Topical BioMedics, Inc.
306 Van Dale Road
West Hurley, NY 12491
Represented By
Michelle Lynn Trier
Genova, Malin & Trier, LLP
contact info
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 2:08 PM EDT
Appellant
AltWellRX, Inc.
124 N. Swinton Avenue
Delray Beach, FL 33444
Represented By
John P. Campo
Akerman LLP
contact info
Appellee
Topical BioMedics, Inc.
306 Van Dale Road
West Hurley, NY 12491
Represented By
Michelle Lynn Trier
Genova, Malin & Trier, LLP
contact info
In Re
Topical Biomedics, Inc.
306 Van Dale Road
West Hurley, NY 12491
Represented By
Michelle Lynn Trier
Genova, Malin & Trier, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/23 1:17 PM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting7 MOTION for Michael D. Napoli to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for appellant AltWellRX, Inc. The motion of Michael D. Napoli, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/23/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 04/23 9:06 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 7 MOTION for Michael D. Napoli to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for appellant AltWellRX, Inc.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30969863. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office s. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 5:45 PM
MOTION for Michael D. Napoli to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for appellant AltWellRX, Inc. . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30969863. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AltWellRX, Inc...(Napoli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Michael D. Napoli in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Monday, April 21, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard P. Magaliff on behalf of AltWellRX, Inc...(Magaliff, Howard)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/21 2:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkgc)
Related: [-]
4 4 appeal Notice of Record of Appeal Availability (Completion) Mon 04/21 2:01 PM
NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re:1 Bankruptcy Appeal. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. Appellant Brief due by 5/21/2025. (bkgc)
Related: [-]
3 3 appeal Designation of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Mon 04/21 1:51 PM
COUNTER DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re:1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Document filed by Appellee Topical BioMedics, Inc. (bkgc)
Related: [-]
2 2 appeal Designation of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Mon 04/21 1:47 PM
DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re:1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Document filed by Appellant AltWellRX, Inc. (bkgc)
Related: [-]
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Mon 04/21 1:43 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Kyu Young Paek dated February 26, 2025. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 24-09028A, 24-B-36109(KYP). Document filed by AltWellRX, Inc.(bkgc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 04/21 2:00 PM
Case Designated ECF. (bkgc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 04/21 2:41 PM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (bkgc)
Related: [-]