Member Case
Lead case is: 4:25-bk-90127

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Lopez
Case #: 4:25-bk-90137
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Ascend Performance Materials Texas Inc.
1010 Travis St Ste 900
Houston, TX 77002-5928
Represented By
Jason Gary Cohen
Bracewell LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/24 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Joint Administration
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 court No Creditor Mailing List Tue 04/22 4:17 PM
No Creditor Mailing List (sat4)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Joint Administration Tue 04/22 11:26 AM
Order for Joint Administration under 25-90127 Signed on 4/22/2025 (rgs4)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Tue 04/22 11:27 AM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 25-90127 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (rgs4)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
1 1 22 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Mon 04/21 1:43 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Ascend Performance Materials Texas Inc.. (Cohen, Jason)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 04/21 3:51 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-90137 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A26091299. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]