California Northern District Court
Judge:Laurel Beeler
Case #: 3:25-cv-03484
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Case in other court:Rene C. Davidson Courthouse, 25CV114576
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 12:14 PM PDT
Defendant
Kinetic Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff
Christopher Polite


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
10 10 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 04/22 11:02 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Kinetic Systems, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Kinetics Holding GmbH, Other Affiliate Kinetic Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Christopher Polite, Other Affiliate West Coast Trial Lawyers, APLC, Other Affiliate Exyte Group for Kinetic Systems, Inc.. (Kierig, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 04/22 10:46 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/17/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2025 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 04/22 10:34 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kinetic Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kinetics Holding GmbH for Kinetic Systems, Inc.. (Kierig, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 04/22 10:23 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Incorrect event used for3 Statement. Please re-file in its entirety, using event Certificate of Interested Entities/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Within ECF, select: Civil Events > Other Filings > Notices > Certificate of Interested Entities/Corporate Disclosure Statement > Corporate Disclosure Statement . When prompted, please enter all affiliates or corporate parents. For4 Certificate of Interested Entities, filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Please re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents.*** Re:3 Statement filed by Kinetic Systems, Inc.,4 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Kinetic Systems, Inc. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
7 7 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 04/21 3:36 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/5/2025. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/21 3:27 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Kinetic Systems, Inc. 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Kinetic Systems, Inc. (smc, COURT STAFF) . (Kierig, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 04/21 1:59 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kinetic Systems, Inc. (Kierig, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 04/21 1:41 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Kinetic Systems, Inc. (Kierig, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement Mon 04/21 1:35 PM
Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kinetic Systems, Inc.. (Kierig, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/21 1:19 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Kinetic Systems, Inc. . (Kierig, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 04/21 1:07 PM
Answer to Removal Complaint, See Attachment #4 of Notice of Removal by Kinetic Systems, Inc. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Stephanie A. Kierig in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court,
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B: Proof of Service of Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit C: Answer to Complaint
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 04/21 1:31 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Updated Civil Cover Sheet required. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Please refer to our court website for all updated documentation. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. Re:2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Kinetic Systems, Inc. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]