California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 3:25-cv-03481
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 1:06 PM PDT
Defendant
Kristi Noem, Secretary of Homeland Security
Defendant
Todd M. Lyons, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Plaintiff
Emma Bai
Represented By
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
9 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 Summons Issued as to Kristi Noem, Secretary of Homeland Security, Todd M. Lyons, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/5/2025. (amf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Emma Bai.(Wolfsdorf, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration Banias Declaration,
Att: 3 Declaration Bai Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit A: USCIS NOID,
Att: 5 Exhibit B: Transcript
3 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Emma Bai (Wolfsdorf, Bernard)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons.(Wolfsdorf, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Proposed Summons ICE
1 1 COMPLAINT against Kristi Noem, Secretary of Homeland Security, Todd M. Lyons, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20588526.). Filed by Emma Bai.(Wolfsdorf, Bernard) Modified on 4/21/2025 (jml, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet