Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Chad F Kenney
Case #: 2:25-cv-02009
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Case in other court:Montgomery County Pennsylvania, 25-05967
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 4:07 PM EDT
Defendant
HORIZON SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
RICHARD J. MARGOLIS
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Plaintiff
PHILADELPHIA CONTRIBUTIONSHIP
Represented By
GEORGE B. KEAHEY
Venema, Proko & Keahey
contact info


Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 05/14 9:18 AM
ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS HEREBY REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI TO CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROVIDED THE PARTIES CERTIFY THEY ARE READY TO PROCEED WITH ONE IN GOOD FAITH. THE PARTIES MAY SEEK A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ONLY IF AND WHEN THE PARTIES ARE IN A REALISTIC POSITION TO SETTLE AND REQUIRE SETTLEMENT ASSISTANCE. THE PARTIES MUST BE THOROUGHLY PREPARED AND MUST READ AND FOLLOW MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARKSIS REQUIREMENTS FOR THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT AN IN PERSON, ON THE RECORD INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) IS SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 3, 2025 AT 10:30 A.M. BEFORE THE HON. CHAD F. KENNEY, IN COURTROOM 11B, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106. ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 5/13/2025. 5/14/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
17 17 misc Statement Mon 05/12 3:50 PM
Statement Disclosure Statement Form as Amended by HORIZON SERVICES, INC.. (MARGOLIS, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
16 16 discov Disclosure of Citizenship Mon 05/12 3:45 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by HORIZON SERVICES, INC. re13 Disclosure of Citizenship Amended . (MARGOLIS, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/07 4:23 PM
ORDER THAT AFTER REVIEW OF THE DOCKET AND DEFENDANT HORIZONS CITIZENSHIP DISCLOSURE (ECF NO. 13), THE COURT HAS FOUND THAT THE CITIZENSHIP DISCLOSURE (ECF NO. 13) IS NOT SUFFICIENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT HORIZON SHALL IDENTIFY AND GIVE THE RESIDENCY OF EACH PARTNER IN THE LLC AND THE PARTNERS OF THE OWNER LLC BY 12:00 P.M. ON MAY 14, 2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 5/7/2025. 5/7/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/06 4:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by HORIZON SERVICES, INC..(MARGOLIS, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
13 13 discov Disclosure of Citizenship Tue 04/29 12:07 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by HORIZON SERVICES, INC. . (MARGOLIS, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
12 12 discov Disclosure of Citizenship Thu 04/24 12:10 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by PHILADELPHIA CONTRIBUTIONSHIP a/s/o Ozdemir . (KEAHEY, GEORGE)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/24 11:45 AM
ORDER THAT AFTER REVIEW OF THE DOCKET AND IT BEING ALLEGED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL (ECF NO. 1, PAGE 3) THAT THIS COURT HAS SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION OVER THIS CASE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1332, AND BECAUSE THERE IS DIVERSITY OF CITIZENSHIP BETWEEN THE PARTIES, EACH PARTY TO THE ACTION IS REQUIRED AND ORDERED TO FILE OF RECORD THEIR DISCLOSURE OF CITIZENSHIP IN DIVERSITY JURISDICTION CASES (FORM ATTACHED), BY 12:00 P.M. ON APRIL 30, 2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/24/2025. 4/24/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Thu 04/24 11:41 AM
ORDER THAT IT APPEARING TO THE COURT THAT DEFENDANT HORIZON SERVICES, INC. HAS NOT FILED THE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT REQUIRED BY FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 AT THE TIME OF FILING ITS FIRST APPEARANCE, DEFENDANT HORIZON SERVICES, INC. IS HEREBY ORDERED TO FILE ITS DISCLOSURE STATEMENT BY 12:00 P.M. ON OR BEFORE APRIL 30, 2025. THIS ORDER ALSO SERVES AS A REMINDER TO DEFENDANT HORIZON SERVICES, INC. OF ITS CONTINUING OBLIGATION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1(B)(2) TO PROMPTLY FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF ANY CHANGES TO THE INFORMATION REQUIRED BY FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1(A). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/24/2025. 4/24/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 04/24 11:37 AM
ORDERED THAT THE REMOVING DEFENDANT SHALL, ON ECF, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 5/21/2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/24/2025. 4/24/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/24 11:34 AM
ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(1), (B)(2), (B)(3), (B)(6), (E), OR (F), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTERS. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST SEVEN (7) DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/24/2025. 4/24/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge (Not Social Security) Thu 04/24 9:23 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by PHILADELPHIA CONTRIBUTIONSHIP.. (KEAHEY, GEORGE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 misc Notice Re: Magistrate Consent Wed 04/23 4:03 PM
Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment(sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent
5 5 misc State Court Record - Attachment Wed 04/23 8:23 AM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County. (CCP - Montgomery County, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Tue 04/22 11:56 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with certificate of Service by PHILADELPHIA CONTRIBUTIONSHIP.(KEAHEY, GEORGE)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/22 10:08 AM
NOTICE by HORIZON SERVICES, INC. Designation Form (MARGOLIS, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/22 9:59 AM
NOTICE by HORIZON SERVICES, INC. Civil Cover Sheet (MARGOLIS, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Mon 04/21 3:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HORIZON SERVICES (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18231078), filed by HORIZON SERVICES.(MARGOLIS, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint - State Court
misc Attorney Required Forms Mon 04/21 3:36 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file CIVIL COVER SHEET and DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Forms are missing. (sbt)
Related: [-]