Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Kathleen M Williams
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:25-cv-21815
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 5:09 PM EDT
Defendant
Mulco Watches, Inc.
Plaintiff
Oscar Herrera
Represented By
Roderick Victor Hannah
Roderick V. Hannah, Esq., P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
10 10 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 05/08 3:21 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Oscar Herrera. Mulco Watches, Inc. served on 5/7/2025, response/answer due 5/28/2025. (Hannah, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
9 9 notice Certificate of Counsel Wed 04/30 10:33 AM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re6 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other, by Roderick Victor Hannah on behalf of Oscar Herrera (Hannah, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
8 8 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 04/25 11:46 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 4/25/2025. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 04/24 11:28 AM
Summons Issued as to Mulco Watches, Inc.. (jas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 7 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Thu 04/24 7:59 AM
ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES IN ADA CASES, referring case to Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/23/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Wed 04/23 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Oscar Herrera re1 Complaint filed by Oscar Herrera (Hannah, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/22 11:44 AM
Plaintiff's NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet and Summons by Oscar Herrera re 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Hannah, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s)
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 order Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Tue 04/22 11:37 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jas)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 04/22 11:36 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (jas)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/21 4:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Mulco Watches, Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18385513, filed by Oscar Herrera.(Hannah, Roderick)
Related: [-]