Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:J Philip Calabrese
Referred: Darrell A Clay
Case #: 1:25-cv-00798
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:402 Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy Fri 04/25 11:24 AM
Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Magistrate Judges Initial Order Fri 04/25 11:23 AM
Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant is granted a maximum of 60 calendar days after notice of the complaint is served on it to file the certified transcript of the administrative record. Plaintiff must file its Brief on the Merits within 45 calendar days of the filing of the Administrative Transcript. If Plaintiff's Brief on the Merits is not filed within 45 calendar days after the Administrative Transcript, the case may be subject to dismissal for want of prosecution without further notice. Defendant's Brief on the Merits must be filed within 45 calendar days thereafter. Plaintiff's Reply Brief, if any, shall be filed within 14 days of filing of Defendant's Brief. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 4/25/2025. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis Fri 04/25 11:21 AM
Order granting Plaintiff's2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 4/25/2025.(R,Ke)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order reassigning case Fri 04/25 10:24 AM
Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 4/25/2025. (P,G)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 04/25 10:30 AM
Random Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. Related [+]. (S,HR)
Related: [-] .#4
order Automatic Reference of Administrative Action Fri 04/25 10:34 AM
Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 4/25/25. (S,HR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Fri 04/25 10:37 AM
Copy of4 Order of Reassignment, and copies of 4/25/25 NEFs reassigning and referring case to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay mailed to Christopher George Taylor at 116 College Ave., Apt. A, Ashland, OH 44805. (S,HR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Fri 04/25 11:27 AM
Copy of5 Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis,6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order,7 Magistrate Consent Package mailed to Christopher George Taylor, Apt A 116 College Ave., Ashland, OH 44805 on 4/25/2025. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 order Administrative Track DCM Initial Order Mon 04/21 3:45 PM
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Sara Lioi. (B,Ch)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/21 3:43 PM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Christopher George Taylor. Related document(s)1 . (B,Ch) (B,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/21/2025) Corrected Motion
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/21 3:40 PM
Complaint for Review of a Social Security Disability or Supplemental Security Income Decision against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Filing fee not paid, IFP.. Filed by Christopher George Taylor. (B,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 04/21 3:41 PM
Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (B,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 04/21 3:42 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (B,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice of Social Security Complaint Mon 04/21 3:44 PM
Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (B,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Civil Cover Sheet Remark re Pro Se Service Mon 04/21 3:58 PM
Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Without the Civil Cover Sheet, the Clerk does not know if this case is related to or is a refiling of a pending/terminated case in this Court., Copy of1 Complaint,3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order, Local Rule 9.1 requirement-Notice to Claimants in Social Security Cases, and a blank Civil Cover Sheet mailed to Christopher George Taylor Apt A 116 College Ave. Ashland, OH 44805 on 4/21/2025. Related document(s)1 ,3 . (B,Ch)
Related: [-]
order Automatic Reference of Administrative Action Mon 04/21 4:01 PM
Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp pursuant to Local Rule 72.2.. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 4/21/2025. (B,Ch)
Related: [-]