Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict Thu 04/24 12:19 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered: ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND EXCLUDABLE DELAY (MAC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Wed 04/23 2:40 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. (LB)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
1 1 motion Motion for Extension of Time to Indict Mon 04/21 5:17 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict to May 27, 2025 Responses due by 5/5/2025 (Dell'Anno, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order