Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:25-bk-12310
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Off-Road Automotive
13015 County Road 16
Fort Lupton, CO 80621-9215
Represented By
Keri L. Riley
Kutner Brinen Dickey Riley, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294


Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago
Sunday, April 27, 2025
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/27 10:17 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order Setting Hearing
Saturday, April 26, 2025
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/26 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 40. Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Motion For Joint Administration
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors Sat 04/26 10:14 PM
Courts Notice and BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors Related [+]. No. of Notices: 40. Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Friday, April 25, 2025
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/25 11:28 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Off-Road Automotive Related [+]. (Riley, Keri)
Related: [-] 18 Order Setting Hearing
Att: 1 Other Creditor Matrix
18 18 order Set Hearing (Bankruptcy) Fri 04/25 10:11 AM
Order And Notice Of Chapter 11 Scheduling Conference. Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 5/29/2025 at 01:30 PM Courtroom D. (td)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11
Thursday, April 24, 2025
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/24 10:15 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Deficiency
16 16 answer Objection Thu 04/24 3:43 PM
Objection Filed by Benjamin Sales on behalf of US Trustee Related [+]. (Sales, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 8 Application to Employ
15 15 order Joint Administration Thu 04/24 3:34 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Related [+]. (td)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Joint Administration
14 14 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Thu 04/24 9:15 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case & Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 09:30 AM at Telephonic Chapter 11: Phone 888-497-4718, Passcode 6026644#. Last day to oppose dischargeability is 7/28/2025. (rjr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
13 13 3 pgs motion Joint Administration Wed 04/23 4:10 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Of The Following Cases: Case No. 25-12310 KRT and Case No. 25-12312 KHT Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Off-Road Automotive. (Riley, Keri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
12 12 notice 9013-1.1 Notice Wed 04/23 11:33 AM
9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Off-Road Automotive Related [+].. 9013 Objections due by 5/7/2025 for11 ,. (Riley, Keri)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Approve
Att: 1 Other Creditor Matrix
11 11 motion Approve Wed 04/23 11:32 AM
Motion to Approve Payment Procedure for Attorney Fees and Costs Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Off-Road Automotive. (Riley, Keri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
10 10 notice 9013-1.1 Notice Wed 04/23 11:14 AM
9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Off-Road Automotive Related [+].. 9013 Objections due by 5/7/2025 for9 ,. (Riley, Keri)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Approve Retainer
Att: 1 Other Creditor Matrix
9 9 motion Approve Retainer Wed 04/23 11:11 AM
Motion to Approve Retainer In The Amount Of $10,273 Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Off-Road Automotive. (Riley, Keri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
8 8 5 pgs motion Employ Tue 04/22 3:56 PM
Application to Employ Kutner Brinen Dickey Riley, P.C. as Attorneys Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Off-Road Automotive. (Riley, Keri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
7 7 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/22 8:13 AM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Benjamin Sales on behalf of US Trustee... (Sales, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Notice of Deficiency Tue 04/22 7:39 AM
Notice of Deficiency For Omission of Information: Statement of Financial Affairs, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, List of Equity Security Holders, Disclosure Regarding Receivers, Missing document(s) due by 5/5/2025. Related [+]. (td)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11
Monday, April 21, 2025
5 5 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 04/21 3:43 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11([LINK 25-12310 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A33561007. Fee amount 1738.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Resolution Mon 04/21 3:42 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Off-Road Automotive. (Riley, Keri)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Mon 04/21 3:36 PM
Non-Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Off-Road Automotive. (Riley, Keri)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1) Mon 04/21 3:36 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7007.1. Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Off-Road Automotive. (Riley, Keri)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 04/21 3:36 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Total Number of Creditors: 0. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/19/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 08/19/2025. Government Proofs of Claim due by 10/20/2025. (Riley, Keri)
Related: [-]