New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela K Chen
Referred: Lee G Dunst
Case #: 2:25-cv-02207
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause33:1365 Environmental Matters
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 7:02 AM EDT
Defendant
Service Scrap Metal Inc.
Defendant
Michael Taylor
Plaintiff
Sierra Club, Inc.
Represented By
Andie M Altchiler
Super Law Group, LLC
contact info
Julia Kathryn Muench
Super Law Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Kathryn Muench on behalf of Sierra Club, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Muench, Julia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/22 9:42 AM
Summons Issued as to Service Scrap Metal Inc., Michael Taylor. (SMF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 04/22 9:39 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SMF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 04/22 9:32 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SMF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/22 9:38 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SMF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
1 1 48 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/21 6:04 PM
COMPLAINT against Service Scrap Metal Inc., Michael Taylor filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18972533 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Sierra Club, Inc.. (Altchiler, Andie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Violation and Intent to File Suit