Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Bernard M Jones
Case #: 5:25-cv-00458
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Case in other court:Oklahoma County District Court, CJ-24-07966
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 5:09 PM CDT
Defendant
Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Phil R Richards
Mcafee & Taft
contact info
Plaintiff
Mack Whitaker Co Inc
Represented By
Dawn Goeres
Red Dirt Legal, PLLC
contact info
Ben D Baker
Red Dirt Legal, PLLC
contact info
Levi Benjamin Baker
Edmonds Cole Law Firm
contact info
A Laurie Koller
Koller Trial Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 04/29 12:09 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Dawn Goeres on behalf of Mack Whitaker Co Inc (Goeres, Dawn)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 04/29 12:08 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by A Laurie Koller on behalf of Mack Whitaker Co Inc (Koller, A)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 04/29 12:06 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Ben D Baker on behalf of Mack Whitaker Co Inc (Baker, Ben)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Tue 04/29 12:04 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Mack Whitaker Co Inc . (Baker, Levi)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 04/29 12:03 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Levi Benjamin Baker on behalf of Mack Whitaker Co Inc (Baker, Levi)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Fri 04/25 11:10 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company . (Richards, Phil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
2 2 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 04/22 11:10 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Phil R Richards on behalf of Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company (Richards, Phil)
Related: [-]
misc Payment for a Civil Case Tue 04/22 8:49 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4678380. (Richards, Phil)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 04/21 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2024-7966 filed by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company.(rp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Summons_OID Transmittal,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - EOAs-Red Dirt Legal,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - MUSIC Answer,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - State Court Dkt,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet