Florida Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 5:25-bk-50074
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Can't Cook Right LLC
1809 Rhett Pl
Lynn Haven, FL 32444-8320
Represented By
Michael Austen Wynn
Wynn & Associates PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
110 E. Park Avenue Suite 128
Tallahassee, FL 32301


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
22 22 court Hearing SET: AP or BK (PDF/Form) Thu 05/01 11:36 AM
Notice of Emergency Hearing. Hearing scheduled on 5/1/2025 at 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) at/via Tallahassee (2nd Floor Courtroom, U.S. Bankruptcy Courthouse, 110 E. Park Ave.) . Parties may appear at the following alternate location: via Zoom (See FLNB Zoom video and telephone instructions at www.flnb.uscourts.gov/zoom ).. Related [+] SERVICE: Michael Wynn shall serve notice of this emergency/expedited hearing immediately by facsimile or email on all parties as required by applicable Rules and a certificate of service must be filed immediately thereafter. (Weems-Cainion, Janet)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Use Cash Collateral.
21 21 11 pgs motion Motion to Use Cash Collateral Thu 05/01 11:13 AM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Michael Austen Wynn on behalf of Can't Cook Right LLC (Wynn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
20 20 misc Affidavit Wed 04/30 4:53 PM
Affidavit Re: DEBTORS AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ITS VERIFIED EXPEDITED MOTION TO PAY PRE-PETITION CLAIMS OF CRITICAL VENDORS Filed by Darby Fowler on behalf of Can't Cook Right LLC [Re:16 Motion to Pay Critical Vendors]. (Fowler, Darby)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Certificate of Service/Mailing Wed 04/30 11:10 AM
Certificate of Service/Mailing Filed by Michael Austen Wynn on behalf of Can't Cook Right LLC [Re:17 Notice of Hearing]. (Wynn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
18 18 misc Certificate of Service/Mailing Tue 04/29 10:55 AM
Certificate of Service/Mailing Filed by Michael Austen Wynn on behalf of Can't Cook Right LLC [Re:14 Application to Employ,15 Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries,16 Motion to Pay Critical Vendors]. (Wynn, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 court Hearing SET: AP or BK (PDF/Form) Tue 04/29 10:48 AM
Notice of Emergency Preliminary Hearing. Hearing scheduled on 5/1/2025 at 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) at/via Tallahassee (2nd Floor Courtroom, U.S. Bankruptcy Courthouse, 110 E. Park Ave.) . Parties may appear at the following alternate location: via Zoom (See FLNB Zoom video and telephone instructions at www.flnb.uscourts.gov/zoom ).. Related [+] SERVICE: Darby Fowler shall serve notice of this emergency/expedited hearing immediately by facsimile or email on all parties as required by applicable Rules and a certificate of service must be filed immediately thereafter. (Weems-Cainion, Janet)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries,16 Motion to Pay Critical Vendors.
Monday, April 28, 2025
16 16 motion Motion to Pay Critical Vendors Mon 04/28 5:03 PM
Motion to Pay Critical Vendors Filed by Darby Fowler on behalf of Can't Cook Right LLC (Fowler, Darby)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries Mon 04/28 5:00 PM
Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries Filed by Darby Fowler on behalf of Can't Cook Right LLC (Fowler, Darby)
Related: [-]
14 14 12 pgs motion Application to Employ Mon 04/28 4:52 PM
Application to Employ Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Postler, P.A. (110 E. Madison St., Suite 200 Tampa, FL 33602-4700) as Attorneys for the Debtor in Posession Filed by Darby Fowler on behalf of Can't Cook Right LLC (Fowler, Darby)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 26, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/27 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Duties of the Debtor Order, Notice of Status Conference, & Deadline to File Plan.
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 04/27 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case & 341(a) Meeting of Creditors.
Friday, April 25, 2025
11 11 misc Case Management Summary Fri 04/25 3:08 PM
Case Management Summary Filed by Michael Austen Wynn on behalf of Can't Cook Right LLC. (Wynn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/25 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order to File Federal and State Employment Tax Returns and to Deposit State and Federal Taxes.
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/25 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Deadline to Cure Deficiencies.
8 8 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Form) Thu 04/24 3:53 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Case and 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/2/2025 at 09:00 AM, CT, at/via with the U.S. Trustee by telephone at (877) 835-0364, Access Code 4662459 . Proofs of Claims due by 6/30/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/20/2025. Chapter 11 Plan (Subchapter V) due: 7/21/2025. Last day to oppose discharge is 8/1/2025. Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Isom, L.)
Related: [-]
7 7 5 pgs court Order & Notice of Status Conference - Ch 11V (Orig/Amd/Cont/Resch) (Form / PDF) Thu 04/24 1:37 PM
Order Prescribing Subchapter V Operating Procedures, Scheduling Status Conference, and Setting Deadline for Filing Plan Status hearing to be held on 6/11/2025 at 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) at/via Tallahassee (2nd Floor Courtroom, U.S. Bankruptcy Courthouse, 110 E. Park Ave.). Parties may appear at the following alternate location: via Zoom (See FLNB Zoom video and telephone instructions at www.flnb.uscourts.gov/zoom ). Subchapter V Pre-Status Conference Report due: 5/28/2025. Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Weems-Cainion, Janet)
Related: [-]
341info 341 Meeting Info for Ch 11 or 12 or Case Converted to Ch 7 (OUST Only) Thu 04/24 3:50 PM
Trustee's Memo re 341 Meeting: Please schedule Meeting of Creditors to be held at 9:00 AM (CST) on June 2, 2025 in BY TELEPHONE Filed by United States Trustee. (United States Trustee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 trustee Notice of Appointment of Ch. 11 Trustee Wed 04/23 4:32 PM
Notice of Appointment of Kathleen L DiSanto as Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee Filed by United States Trustee. (United States Trustee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verification of DiSanto
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order to File Tax Returns and Make Tax Deposits (Form) Tue 04/22 6:30 PM
Order to File Federal and State Employment Tax Returns and to Deposit State and Federal Taxes signed on 04/22/2025. (ADIapps)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Notice to Cure Petition Deficiencies (Form/PDF) Tue 04/22 11:23 AM
Notice of Deadline to Cure Deficiencies. A complete list of deficient items due from Debtors attached. Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance (Appearance of Attorney) Tue 04/22 10:26 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Conor McLaughlin on behalf of United States Trustee. (McLaughlin, Conor)
Related: [-]
court 5Alpha Case Admin Assignment (NoDoc) Tue 04/22 6:00 AM
Case assigned to Sloane Akinsanya (admin)
Related: [-]
court 5Alpha Case Admin Assignment (NoDoc) Tue 04/22 10:31 AM
Case reassigned to Latonia Isom (Isom, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Online Payment Mon 04/21 5:28 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-50074 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A5515656, amount $1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 04/21 5:27 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition (Non-Individual) (Filing Fee: $1738.00) filed by Can't Cook Right LLC. List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 05/5/2025. Attorney Disclosure Statement due 05/5/2025. BPP Disclosure of Compensation due 05/5/2025. Bankruptcy Petition Preparer Notice, Declaration, and Signature due 05/5/2025. Corporate Ownership Statement due 05/5/2025. Employee Income Record or Statement of No Employee Income due: 05/5/2025. List of Equity Security Holders due 05/5/2025. Schedule A/B due 05/5/2025. Schedule C due 05/5/2025. Schedule D due 05/5/2025. Schedule E/F due 05/5/2025. Schedule G due 05/5/2025. Schedule H due 05/5/2025. Schedule I due 05/5/2025. Schedule J due 05/5/2025. Schedule J-2 due 05/5/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 05/5/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/5/2025. Ch 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income (122B) due 05/5/2025. Deadline to Cure Deficiency(ies): 05/5/2025 . (Wynn, Michael)
Related: [-]