New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:25-cv-03307
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78j(b)ss Stockholder Suit
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 12:11 AM EDT
Defendant
Alliance Reentry Centers, PBC
Defendant
League Network, PBC
Defendant
Jay Whitehead
Plaintiff
Yash Kamat
Represented By
John F. Olsen
The Law Office Of John F. Olsen, LLC
contact info
Gigio Koshy Ninan
Shankar Ninan Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 04/23 6:11 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on July 31, 2025 at 9:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Courts dedicated conference line at (855) 244-8681 and using access code 2303 019 3884, followed by the pound (#) key. When prompted for an attendee ID number, press the pound (#) key again. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Courts Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/23/2025) Initial Conference set for 7/31/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman (ar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 04/22 1:04 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alliance Reentry Centers, PBC, League Network, PBC, Jay Whitehead. (sj)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/22 11:43 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to League Network, Alliance Reentry Centers, Jay Whitehead, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Yash Kamat..(Olsen, John)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Tue 04/22 12:44 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John F. Olsen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: League Network, PBC; Alliance Reentry Centers, PBC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 04/22 12:49 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John F. Olsen. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 12:0022; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:0078j(b); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 04/22 12:51 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 04/22 12:54 PM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 04/22 12:54 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 8:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gigio Koshy Ninan on behalf of Yash Kamat..(Ninan, Gigio)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/21 6:36 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Olsen, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/21 6:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Alliance Reentry Centers, PBC, League Network, PBC, Jay Whitehead. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30962891)Document filed by Yash Kamat..(Olsen, John)
Related: [-]