New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jeannette A Vargas
Case #: 1:25-cv-03309
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2ra Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 12:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Microsoft Corporation
Defendant
David Smith
Plaintiff
Ruth Yakubu
Represented By
Marshall Benjamin Bellovin
Ballon Stoll P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 04/22 2:04 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Smith. (sj)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/22 11:33 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Smith, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Ruth Yakubu..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/22 11:17 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Microsoft Corporation, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Ruth Yakubu..(Bellovin, Marshall) Modified on 4/22/2025 (sj)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 11:01 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bingyang Zhang on behalf of Ruth Yakubu..(Zhang, Bingyang)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 04/22 1:52 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marshall Benjamin Bellovin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 04/22 1:59 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 04/22 2:01 PM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 04/22 2:01 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/22 2:07 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Marshall Benjamin Bellovin to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; incorrect case number listed on PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/21 7:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/21 7:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Microsoft Corporation, David Smith. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30963110)Document filed by Ruth Yakubu..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Notice of Right to Sue