Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Shalina D Kumar
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 4:25-cv-11123
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 1:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Public Service Credit Union
Plaintiff
Benjamin Anthony Johnson
521 Campbell St.
River Rouge, MI 48218


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Tue 04/22 9:29 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (LGra)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 notice Filing Fee Not Paid* Mon 04/21 8:18 AM
Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 5/5/2025 (TTho)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
1 1 7 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Mon 04/21 8:17 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Benjamin Anthony Johnson against Public Service Credit Union (TTho)
Related: [-]