North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Martin Reidinger
Case #: 3:25-cv-00269
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order Directing Monthly Prisoner Payment Tue 04/22 10:45 AM
ORDER granting in forma pauperis status and the correctional facility is to transmit partial payments. The initial partial filing fee is assessed at $67.06. Signed by Clerk Katherine H. Simon on 4/22/2025. (Copy of Order served by mail.) (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(llp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
order Order of Instructions Mon 04/21 2:08 PM
Standing Order of Instructions Regarding Pro Se Prisoner Civil Actions. Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tlj)
Related: [-]
utility Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence Mon 04/21 2:08 PM
Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (tlj)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
3 3 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Mon 04/21 1:54 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) by Austin Nathaniel Hannon(tlj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
2 2 misc Affidavit - 1983 Application IFP Mon 04/21 1:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) re1 Complaint by Austin Nathaniel Hannon(tlj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/21 1:41 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by Austin Nathaniel Hannon.(tlj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment #1,
Att: 2 Envelope