South Carolina District Court
Judge:Joseph Dawson, III
Referred: Thomas E Rogers, III
Case #: 4:25-cv-03293
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
8 8 misc Document Mailed Thu 04/24 2:19 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:6 Proper Form Order w/NEF, Complaint form for Violation of Civil Rights, (1)USM-285, 7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Timothy Augustus Ward, 411 N. Ocean Blvd. Myrtle Beach, SC, 29577 (dsto, )
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/24 2:18 PM
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per 6 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 04/24/2025.(dsto, )
Related: [-]
6 6 order Proper Form Order Thu 04/24 2:16 PM
PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 5/15/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 04/24/2025. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/21 11:30 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Related [+] by Timothy Augustus Ward. Response to Motion due by 5/2/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(prou, )
Related: [-] stricted Access
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/21 11:28 AM
COMPLAINT against Khalil Love, filed by Timothy Augustus Ward. Service due by 7/17/2025.(prou, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope