California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Stephen L Johnson
Case #: 5:25-bk-50576
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 14, 2025

Debtor
Dick W. Koo, DDS, Inc.
827 Blossom Hill Rd Ste E8
San Jose, CA 95123-2701
Represented By
Julie H. Rome-Banks
Binder Malter Harris & Rome-Banks LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Fred Hjelmeset
P.O.Box 4188
Mountain View, CA 94040
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ
U.S. Federal Bldg. 280 S 1st St. #268
San Jose, CA 95113


Docket last updated: 04/22/2025 12:02 AM PDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
crditcrd none Mon 04/21 3:55 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 25-50576 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00). Receipt number A33815524, amount $ 338.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 04/21 3:54 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $338. Filed by Dick W. Koo, DDS, Inc.. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 05/5/2025. (Rome-Banks, Julie)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Mon 04/21 3:57 PM
Meeting of Creditors and Appointment of Interim Trustee Fred Hjelmeset with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/14/2025 at 11:30 AM via Zoom Trustee - Hjelmeset: Meeting ID 953 232 3435, Passcode 4903246876, Phone 1-650-935-4846. (Rome-Banks, Julie)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Designate Responsible Individual Mon 04/21 4:47 PM
Application to Designate Dr. Dick W. Koo as Responsible Individual Application to Approve Designation of Responsible Individual for Corporate Debtor Filed by Debtor Dick W. Koo, DDS, Inc. (Rome-Banks, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service