California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Barry Russell
Case #: 2:25-bk-13286
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 30, 2025

Debtor
Global International S, Inc.
3500 Linden Ave Apt 205
Long Beach, CA 90807-4575
Represented By
Kevin Tang
Tang & Associates
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Howard M Ehrenberg (TR)
1875 Century Park East Suite 1900
Los Angeles, CA 90067
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/22/2025 12:08 AM PDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 04/21 6:33 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:25-bk-13286] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58317674. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 04/21 5:57 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Global International S, Inc. (Tang, Kevin)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Mon 04/21 7:06 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Ehrenberg (TR), Howard M with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/30/2025 at 08:00 AM via Zoom - Ehrenberg: Meeting ID 533 861 1826, Passcode 7827374051, Phone 1 213 592 2649. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]