California Central District Court
Judge:Anne Hwang
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:25-cv-03527
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 12:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Bytedance Inc.
Defendant
Bytedance Ltd.
Defendant
TikTok Inc.
Defendant
TikTok LLC
Defendant
TikTok Ltd
Defendant
TikTok Pte. Ltd.
Defendant
TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc.
Plaintiff
J. B.
Represented By
Andre M Mura
Gibbs Mura LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tessa Green
Represented By
Andre M Mura
Gibbs Mura LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
S. V.
Represented By
Andre M Mura
Gibbs Mura LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristi Vazquez
Represented By
Andre M Mura
Gibbs Mura LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Sunday, April 27, 2025
17 17 notice Appearance Sun 04/27 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric H Gibbs on behalf of Plaintiffs Tessa Green, Kristi Vazquez (Attorney Eric H Gibbs added to party Tessa Green(pty:pla), Attorney Eric H Gibbs added to party Kristi Vazquez(pty:pla))(Gibbs, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 12:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Kristi Vazquez, Tessa Green. Waiver of Service signed by Daniel M. Petrocelli. (Mura, Andre)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 12:00 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Kristi Vazquez, Tessa Green. Waiver of Service signed by Daniel M. Petrocelli. (Mura, Andre)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 11:58 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Kristi Vazquez, Tessa Green. Waiver of Service signed by Daniel M. Petrocelli. (Mura, Andre)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 11:56 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Kristi Vazquez, Tessa Green. Waiver of Service signed by Daniel M. Petrocelli. (Mura, Andre)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 11:54 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Kristi Vazquez, Tessa Green. Waiver of Service signed by Daniel M. Petrocelli. (Mura, Andre)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 11:53 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Kristi Vazquez, Tessa Green. Waiver of Service signed by Daniel M. Petrocelli. (Mura, Andre)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 11:51 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Kristi Vazquez, Tessa Green. Waiver of Service signed by Daniel M. Petrocelli. (Mura, Andre)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/23 9:46 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants ByteDance Inc., ByteDance LTD., TikTok Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok Ltd, TikTok Pte. Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security Inc.. (sh)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 04/23 9:45 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 04/23 9:44 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 04/23 9:44 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Anne Hwang and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
5 5 notice Related Case(s) Mon 04/21 10:42 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs J. B., Tessa Green, S. V., Kristi Vazquez. Related Case(s): 2:25-ml-03144 (Mura, Andre)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 04/21 10:41 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs J. B., Tessa Green, S. V., Kristi Vazquez. (Mura, Andre)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 04/21 10:38 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs J. B., Tessa Green, S. V., Kristi Vazquez, (Mura, Andre)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 04/21 10:33 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs J. B., Tessa Green, S. V., Kristi Vazquez. (Mura, Andre)
Related: [-]
1 1 39 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 04/21 10:29 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-39552149 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs J. B., Kristi Vazquez, Tessa Green, S. V.. (Attorney Andre M Mura added to party J. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Andre M Mura added to party Tessa Green(pty:pla), Attorney Andre M Mura added to party S. V.(pty:pla), Attorney Andre M Mura added to party Kristi Vazquez(pty:pla))(Mura, Andre)
Related: [-]