Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Holly A Brady
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:25-cv-00195
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 11:10 AM EDT
Defendant
Keystone Cooperative, Inc f/k/a Ceres Solutions Cooperative, Inc. d/b/a Ceres Solutions Cooperative
Frost Brown Todd 111 Monument Circle Suite 4500
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Brett A Hession
Frost Brown Todd Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Bradley B. Fry
Myers & Wallace, LLP 809 S. Calhoun St. Ste. 400
Fort Wayne, IN 46802


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/24 3:20 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keystone Cooperative, Inc. (Hession, Brett)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 04/24 1:11 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins:5 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement is not fully compliant with General order 2023-06. Dft is ordered to file an amended corporate disclosure statement on or before 5/1/2025. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
11 11 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Wed 04/23 1:08 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Wed 04/23 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2025 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. To connect to the conference, Parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID: 161 6325 2172#, push # to skip entry of participant ID and enter passcode 039039# at least five minutes before the conference start time. (mr)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 04/23 10:25 AM
**NEW CASE**Chief Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (ely)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Heather L Wilson on behalf of Keystone Cooperative, Inc f/k/a Ceres Solutions Cooperative, Inc. d/b/a Ceres Solutions Cooperative (Wilson, Heather)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brett A Hession on behalf of Keystone Cooperative, Inc f/k/a Ceres Solutions Cooperative, Inc. d/b/a Ceres Solutions Cooperative (Hession, Brett)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice - Other Tue 04/22 2:48 PM
NOTICE by Keystone Cooperative, Inc f/k/a Ceres Solutions Cooperative, Inc. d/b/a Ceres Solutions Cooperative Defendants First Unopposed Notice of Automatic Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint to May 27, 2025 (Hession, Brett)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/22 2:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keystone Cooperative, Inc f/k/a Ceres Solutions Cooperative, Inc. d/b/a Ceres Solutions Cooperative. (Hession, Brett)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice - Other Tue 04/22 2:43 PM
NOTICE by Keystone Cooperative, Inc f/k/a Ceres Solutions Cooperative, Inc. d/b/a Ceres Solutions Cooperative Declaration of Service(Hession, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal through the Steuben Circuit Courts IEFS
3 3 misc Amended Document - NOT Motion Tue 04/22 11:31 AM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Keystone Cooperative, Inc f/k/a Ceres Solutions Cooperative, Inc. d/b/a Ceres Solutions Cooperative. Amendment to2 Amended Document,1 Notice of Removal, Amended Exhibit to Notice of Removal . (Hession, Brett)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Amended Document - NOT Motion Tue 04/22 11:21 AM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Keystone Cooperative, Inc f/k/a Ceres Solutions Cooperative, Inc. d/b/a Ceres Solutions Cooperative. Amendment to1 Notice of Removal, Amended Exhibit . (Hession, Brett)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 04/22 11:06 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5882031.) from Steuben Circuit Court, Cause No. 76C01-2503-CT-000190, filed by Keystone Cooperative, Inc f/k/a Ceres Solutions Cooperative, Inc. d/b/a Ceres Solutions Cooperative.(Hession, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civile Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings
Friday, March 28, 2025
9 9 cmp State Court Complaint Wed 04/23 10:45 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Keystone Cooperative, Inc, filed by Bradley B. Fry in Steuben Circuit Court #76C01-2503-CT-000190.(ely)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit