Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:James E Grimes Jr
Case #: 1:25-cv-00805
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
6 6 order Magistrate Judges Initial Order Thu 04/24 8:55 AM
Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 04/24/2025. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis Thu 04/24 8:52 AM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 04/24/2025.(M,MT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 order Consent to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/22 11:16 AM
Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr. for further proceedings. Related Document4 . Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 4/22/2025. (R,Sh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (atty event) Tue 04/22 10:54 AM
Joint Notice of Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Aracelis Ayala. Related document(s)1 ,.(Margolius, Marcia)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Administrative Track DCM Initial Order Tue 04/22 8:57 AM
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Sara Lioi. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/22 7:26 AM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Aracelis Ayala. Related document(s)1 . (Margolius, Marcia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 7:25 AM
Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Aracelis Ayala. (Margolius, Marcia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 04/22 8:55 AM
Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. assigned to case. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 04/22 8:56 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice of Social Security Complaint Tue 04/22 8:56 AM
Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
order Automatic Reference of Administrative Action Tue 04/22 8:58 AM
Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 04/22 11:19 AM
Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. assigned to case pursuant to consent. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. terminated. Related document5 . (H,Ch)
Related: [-]