Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Lori S Simpson
Case #: 0:25-bk-13537
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Real Estate Managemet & Consulting LLC
8507 Oxon Hill Rd Ste 200 PMB 47
Fort Washington, MD 20744-4774
Represented By
Real Estate Managemet & Consulting LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee - Greenbelt
6305 Ivy Lane, Suite 600
Greenbelt, MD 20770


Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket) Sat 04/26 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Dismissing Case
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK (Auto-Docket) Sat 04/26 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Dismissing Case
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK (Auto-Docket) Sat 04/26 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Dismissing Case
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 order Dismissing Case Wed 04/23 11:28 AM
Order Dismissing Case And Notice That Automatic Stay Is Terminated Filing Fee Balance Due: $0.00. . (Horning, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/22 12:30 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Morgan, Courtney)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Social Security Number Verification Page Tue 04/22 11:14 AM
Social Security Number Verification Page Filed by Real Estate Managemet & Consulting LLC . (Horning, Kelly)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) - Court Use Tue 04/22 10:49 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Individual Filed by Real Estate Managemet & Consulting LLC . Ch 11 Plan Subch V Due by 7/21/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/20/2025. (Arter, Laurie) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2025 (Horning, Kelly). Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2025 (Horning, Kelly)
Related: [-]
court Receipt of Filing Fee (Auto-Docket) Tue 04/22 5:45 PM
Chapter 11 filing fee paid. Receipt Number 22003196. Fee Amount $ 1,738.00 received by DF. (admin)
Related: [-]