Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Colin Stirling Bruce
Case #: 1:25-cv-01150
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
order Order on Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/30 10:47 AM
TEXT ORDER granting3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 4/30/2025. Plaintiff's trust fund ledgers indicate he has no funds to make an initial partial payment of the filing fee. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b) (4), the initial partial filing fee is waived. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (KE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
6 6 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Ledger Tue 04/29 3:17 PM
+++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Stephon Harshaw. (DS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 misc Letter Requesting Trust Fund Ledger Tue 04/22 12:10 PM
Letter Requesting Trust Fund Ledger. Trust fund ledger sheets due by 5/6/2025. (KE)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Request Counsel Tue 04/22 12:21 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 4/22/2025. Plaintiff's motion to request counsel4 is DENIED. The Court generally will not consider recruiting counsel for a pro se plaintiff until the Court determines that he possess a claim upon which relief can be granted after the Court conducts a review of the complaint. Plaintiff may renew his motion if his claim survives that review that the Court will conduct in the near future. (KE)
Related: [-]
order Order Tue 04/22 12:23 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 4/22/2025. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 requires all litigants or their attorney to sign every pleading or motion filed with the Court. Plaintiff failed to sign his Complaint that he filed on April 21, 2025. Given his pro se status, the Court will not strike his Complaint. In the future, however, the Court may strike pleadings and motions that are filed by Plaintiff that he has not signed. (KE)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
4 4 motion Request Counsel Tue 04/22 9:45 AM
MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Stephon Harshaw. Responses due by 5/5/2025 (VH)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/22 9:43 AM
PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Stephon Harshaw.(VH)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Opening Tue 04/22 9:42 AM
NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802. Merit Review Deadline set for 5/12/2025.(VH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Privacy
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 9:41 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Stephon Harshaw.(VH)
Related: [-]