New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Anne Y Shields
Case #: 2:25-cv-02213
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 12:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Defendant
Becton, Dickinson and Company
Defendant
C.R. Bard, Inc.
Plaintiff
Justin Moundas
Represented By
Thomas J. McKenna
Gainey Mckenna & Egleston
contact info


Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 04/24 10:00 AM
Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., Becton, Dickinson and Company, C.R. Bard, Inc.. (IL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/23 1:20 PM
Proposed Summons. Re Quality Control Check - Summons,1 Complaint, by Justin Moundas (McKenna, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons re Becton, Dickinson & Co,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons re C.R. Bard
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Tue 04/22 2:19 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (LJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 04/22 2:17 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 04/22 11:12 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
1 1 56 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 10:15 AM
COMPLAINT against Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., Becton, Dickinson and Company, C.R. Bard, Inc. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18973840 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Justin Moundas. (McKenna, Thomas) Modified on 4/22/2025 (LJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons re Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons re Becton, Dickinson and Company,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons re C.R. Bard, Inc.
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/22 2:19 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Tue 04/22 2:20 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for the following reason: The full case caption must appear on the summons and/or a rider. Please correct and resubmit using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (LJ)
Related: [-]