Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:25-bk-10262

Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David E Rice
Case #: 1:25-ap-00105
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
JRCM, LLC-d/b/a Judgment Recovery Center
assignee of M&M Bail Bond, Inc. P.O. Box 27694
Towson, MD 21285
Represented By
JRCM, LLC-d/b/a Judgment Recovery Center
contact info
Plaintiff
Toshia Jeanell Little
P.O. Box 4124
Baltimore, MD 21205
Represented By
Charlene A. Wilson
Law Office Of Charlene A. Wilson
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP (Auto-Docket) Fri 04/25 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 04/22 12:08 PM
Summons Issued on JRCM, LLC-d/b/a Judgment Recovery Center Date Issued 4/22/2025, Answer Due 5/22/2025 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/9/2025 at 10:00 AM. Virtual hearing - For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Scott, Cherita)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Toshia Jeanell Little
1 1 cmp Complaint (Case Opening) Tue 04/22 12:45 AM
Adversary case 25-00105 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Charlene A. Wilson on behalf of Toshia Jeanell Little against JRCM, LLC-d/b/a Judgment Recovery Center. The filing fee is EXEMPT - Plaintiff is the debtor in the Bankruptcy case. (Wilson, Charlene)
Related: [-]