California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Julia W Brand
Case #: 2:25-bk-13300
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
CUCL Corporation
555 4th St Unit 450
San Francisco, CA 94107-1626
Represented By
Mark S Horoupian
Greenspoon Marder, PA
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Hatty K Yip
Office Of The Ust/doj
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 04/30 9:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Monday, April 28, 2025
8 8 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1) Mon 04/28 12:00 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/20/2025 at 09:15 AM at UST-LA2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-816-0394, PARTICIPANT CODE:5282999. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/21/2025. (LL2)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 04/25 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor CUCL Corporation
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 04/25 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor CUCL Corporation
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 court Process Paid Request for Certified Copy Tue 04/22 5:00 PM
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Request for a Certified Copy Tue 04/22 4:06 PM
Request for a Certified Copy Fee Amount $12. The document will be sent via email to :Karen.Files@gmlaw.com: Filed by Debtor CUCL Corporation Related [+]. (Horoupian, Mark)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
1 1 15 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/22 10:21 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by CUCL Corporation Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 05/6/2025. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 05/6/2025. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 05/6/2025. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 05/6/2025. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 05/6/2025. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 05/6/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 05/6/2025. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 05/6/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 05/6/2025. (Horoupian, Mark)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 04/22 10:27 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:25-bk-13300] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58319713. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 04/22 4:36 PM
Receipt of Request for a Certified Copy([LINK:2:25-bk-13300-WB] ) [misc,paycert] ( 12.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58322320. Fee amount 12.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc# 3