California Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean C Riordan
Case #: 2:25-cv-01166
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Case in other court:Solano County Superior Court, CU25-02416
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 11:08 AM PDT
Defendant
Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By
Mehgan Anne Gallagher
Theta Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jameyia Janae Morris
Represented By
Gregory Sogoyan
Quill & Arrow, LLP
contact info
Luis A Serrano
Quill & Arrow LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
7 7 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Mon 05/05 9:30 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Gallagher, Mehgan)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Mon 05/05 9:29 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Mon 05/05 4:11 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Serrano, Luis)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/28 3:08 PM
ANSWER by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.(Gallagher, Mehgan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/23 10:14 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Soheyl Tahsildoost on behalf of Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Attorney Tahsildoost, Soheyl added. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
2 2 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Tue 04/22 9:42 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Deputy Clerk AMW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
Monday, April 21, 2025
1 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Solano County Superior Court, case number CU25-02416 by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-12172031)(Gallagher, Mehgan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement