Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Benita Y Pearson
Referred: James E Grimes Jr
Case #: 1:25-cv-00808
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
6 6 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy Thu 04/24 9:12 AM
Magistrate Consent Package issued. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Magistrate Judges Initial Order Thu 04/24 9:11 AM
Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 04/24/2025. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis Thu 04/24 9:06 AM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 04/24/2025.(M,MT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 order Administrative Track DCM Initial Order Tue 04/22 11:59 AM
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Sara Lioi. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Status Report (atty event) Tue 04/22 11:51 AM
Status Report filed by Tina Marie Stitzlein. (Wicklund, Edward)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/22 11:50 AM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Tina Marie Stitzlein. (Wicklund, Edward)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 11:48 AM
Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Tina Marie Stitzlein. (Wicklund, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeal Council Action,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 04/22 11:56 AM
Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 04/22 11:57 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice of Social Security Complaint Tue 04/22 11:58 AM
Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
order Automatic Reference of Administrative Action Tue 04/22 12:01 PM
Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 4/22/2025. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]