Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:25-bk-10265

Wisconsin Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Catherine J Furay
Case #: 1:25-ap-00013
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michael S. Dunn
232640 Vilas Street
Athens, WI 54411
Represented By
Michael S. Dunn
contact info
Plaintiff
Athens Area Credit Union
112 Alfred Street P.O. Box 98
Athens, WI 54411
Represented By
William A Grunewald
Jensen, Scott, Grunewald & Shiffler, Sc
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
8 8 miscad Proof of Service Fri 05/02 4:07 PM
Proof of Service Certificate of Service filed by William A. Grunewald on behalf of Athens Area Credit Union. Related document(s)1 ,3 ,2 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Athens Area Credit Union, Summons Issued, Preliminary Pre-Trial Order. (Grunewald, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
7 7 miscad Proof of Service Wed 04/30 2:12 PM
Proof of Service Affidavit of Non-Service filed by William A. Grunewald on behalf of Athens Area Credit Union. Related document(s)1 ,3 ,2 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Athens Area Credit Union, Summons Issued, Preliminary Pre-Trial Order. (Grunewald, William)
Related: [-]
6 6 miscad Proof of Service Wed 04/30 2:06 PM
Proof of Service Affidavit of Mailing filed by William A. Grunewald on behalf of Athens Area Credit Union. Related document(s)1 ,3 ,2 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Athens Area Credit Union, Summons Issued, Preliminary Pre-Trial Order. (Grunewald, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Summons Thu 04/24 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Summons Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #2 )
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Preliminary Pretrial Order Thu 04/24 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Preliminary Pretrial Order Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #3 )
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 court Preliminary Pretrial Order (auto form) Tue 04/22 10:33 AM
Preliminary Pretrial Order. Signed on 4/22/2025. Related [+]. (Eau Claire, Janis)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto form) Tue 04/22 10:31 AM
Summons to be served by 4/29/2025. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 6/24/2025 at 02:10 PM at Telephone Conference on Compliant . Summons Issued on Michael S. Dunn Answer Due 5/22/2025. Related [+]. (Eau Claire, Janis)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, April 21, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/21 4:29 PM
Adversary case 1 25-00013 Complaint filed by Athens Area Credit Union against Michael S. Dunn [ Fee Amount $ 350]. Nature of Suit: 67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny), 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury) (Grunewald, William)
Related: [-]