Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Brian E Murphy
Case #: 1:25-cv-11063
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 3:09 PM EDT
Defendant
CAROLINE DESOUZA
Plaintiff
Keith Viglione
38 Phillips Drive
Newburyport, MA 01950
Represented By
Thomas E. Kenney
Pierce & Mandell, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/23 9:11 AM
Summons Issued as to Caroline Desouza. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (CEH)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Wed 04/23 9:07 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Brian E. Murphy assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (JKK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
2 2 misc Report on the filing/termination of copyright case Tue 04/22 3:36 PM
REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case. (CEH)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 2:51 PM
COMPLAINT against CAROLINE DESOUZA Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10965592 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Keith Viglione.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form, # 3 Report and Recommendations Report on the Filing of a Copyright Action (Kenney, Thomas) Modified on 4/22/2025 to remove Copyright Report and file it separately. (CEH) Modified on 4/22/2025 to modify docket text (CEH)
Att: 3 Report and Recommendations Report on the Filing of a Copyright Action