Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gerald A Mchugh
Case #: 2:25-cv-02031
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 3:10 PM EDT
Defendant
ORENS BROTHERS REAL ESTATE, INC.
444 N. 4th Street Suite 104
Philadelphia, PA 19123
Plaintiff
SCHINDLER ELEVATOR CORP.
20 Whippany Road
Morristown, NJ 07960
Represented By
ROBERT WILLIAM STANKO
Kleinbard LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Thu 05/01 10:51 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Timothy L. Weldon/Best Legal Services, Inc. re: served Summons and Complaint upon Guy Orens, owner by Personal Service on 4/28/2025 (STANKO, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 04/23 6:39 AM
Summons Issued as to ORENS BROTHERS REAL ESTATE, INC.. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 04/22 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT against ORENS BROTHERS REAL ESTATE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18234306.), filed by SCHINDLER ELEVATOR CORP..(STANKO, ROBERT) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/22/2025) (sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Agreement