Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Jodi W Dishman
Case #: 5:25-cv-00459
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 2:10 PM CDT
Defendant
Charles A Shadid LLC
Defendant
Chacarze Hishaw
Defendant
Charisse Johnson
Plaintiff
Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Kasi Schuelke
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
John C Lennon
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green-Okc
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Wed 04/30 2:56 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company . (Lennon, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Mon 04/28 9:35 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company . (Lennon, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 notice Entry of Appearance Wed 04/23 2:49 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Kasi Schuelke on behalf of Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company (Schuelke, Kasi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
2 2 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 04/22 2:39 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by John C Lennon on behalf of Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company (Lennon, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Charles A Shadid LLC, Chacarze Hishaw, Charisse Johnson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of ChaRayia Kiwanna-Maria Johnson), Charisse Johnson(as Next Friend of Raegen Maytubby, a minor) filed by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company.(rp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Johnsons Petition filed in the Johnson Suit,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Hishaws Petition filed in the Hishaw Suit,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Order Consolidating Cases,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Policy,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Payment for a Civil Case Tue 04/22 2:32 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4678858. (Lennon, John)
Related: [-]