California Northern District Court
Judge:Sallie Kim
Case #: 3:25-cv-03518
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Case in other court:San Francisco Superior Court, CGC-24-614712
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 1:06 PM PDT
Defendant
Kelly Ann Dominguez
400 Grove St., Unit 101
San Francisco, CA 94102
Plaintiff
CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Office of The City Attorney 1390 Market St, 7th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94102
Represented By
Hunter W. Sims, III
City & County Of San Francisco
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
5 5 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 04/29 9:10 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kelly Ann Dominguez.. (Wood, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 04/28 2:21 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City and County of San Francisco.. (Sims, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 04/24 11:12 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/8/2025. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Filing Fee Received Thu 04/24 11:08 AM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number 311172674. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 04/22 12:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION from Superior Court of The State of California County of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-24-614712. (). Filed by CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO.(Sims, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice to Plaintiff,
Att: 3 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit Answer to Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit Cross-Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit Summons to Cross-Complaint,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 04/22 1:36 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filing fee not paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]