California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: Michael B Kaufman
Case #: 2:25-cv-03546
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 1:07 PM PDT
Defendant
Herbert Hing Sang Lee
Defendant
Ralph's Party Supply
Plaintiff
Ana Ventura
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
12 12 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Thu 04/24 4:05 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lc)
Related: [-]
11 11 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 04/24 3:41 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER THE STATE LAW CLAIM by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 5/8/2025. (tf)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 04/24 3:40 PM
STANDING ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICAN WITH DISABILITIES ACT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 04/24 3:38 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/23 7:51 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Herbert Hing Sang Lee, Ralph's Party Supply. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 04/23 7:50 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 04/23 7:49 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 04/23 7:49 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Michael B. Kaufman. (car)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 04/22 12:23 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Ana Ventura. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 04/22 12:20 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 04/22 12:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ana Ventura. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/22 12:19 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39555977 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Ana Ventura(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]