California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 2:25-cv-03549
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 1:08 PM PDT
Defendant
Third & Hill Development, LLC
Plaintiff
Kenneth Davidson
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
12 12 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Fri 04/25 2:20 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lc)
Related: [-]
11 11 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 04/25 11:49 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER THE STATE LAW CLAIM by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 5/9/2025. (tf)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 04/25 11:47 AM
STANDING ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICAN WITH DISABILITIES ACT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 04/25 11:47 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 04/24 8:35 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Third and Hill Development, LLC. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 04/24 8:20 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 04/24 8:20 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 04/24 8:19 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 04/22 12:27 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Kenneth Davidson. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 04/22 12:26 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 04/22 12:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Davidson. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/22 12:25 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39556129 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Kenneth Davidson(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]