Massachusetts District Court
Judge:George A Otoole, Jr
Case #: 1:25-cv-11066
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 4:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Audi of America Inc.
Represented By
Matthew F Singer
Barack Ferrazzano Kirschbaum & Nagelberg
contact info
Owen Smith
Barack Ferrazzano Kirschbaum & Nagelberg
contact info
Murphy Olivia Glass
Barack Ferrazzano Kirschbaum & Nagelberg
contact info
Plaintiff
25 Route 28, Inc.
Represented By
Jason T. Allen
Bass Sox Mercer
contact info
Respondent
CDK Global, LLC
1950 Hassell Road
Hoffman Estates, IL 60169
Represented By
Brian James Talcott
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info
Richard Polony
Hinshaw & Culbertson
contact info
Matthew Lorenz Pagano
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
22 22 notice Notice to Counsel in Transfer Cases Tue 04/22 3:55 PM
Notice: Counsel who filed an appearance in this case prior to its transfer must refer to[LINK:Local Rule 83.5.3(h)] Practice by Persons Not Members of the Bar on how to proceed as an attorney in this court. General Information for Attorneys can be found[LINK:here] . (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 04/22 3:54 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
20 20 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 04/22 3:49 PM
Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:25-cv-01859.
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
19 19 TRANSFERRED to the District of Massachusetts the electronic record. (smb, )
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER ON CDK, LLC'S AGREED MOTION TO TRANSFER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 4/17/2025. Mailed notice. (exr, )
Related: [-]
17 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: CDK Global, LLC's Agreed Motion to Transfer16 is granted. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case forthwith to the to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts to be heard as a part of the ongoing litigation there in Case No. 23-cv-10877. Enter separate order. Mailed notice. (exr, )
Related: [-]
16 16 MOTION by Respondent CDK Global, LLCTransfer Motion to Compel to Underlying Lawsuit AGREED (Pagano, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
15 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent CDK Global, LLC by Matthew Lorenz Pagano (Pagano, Matthew)
Related: [-]
14 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent CDK Global, LLC by Richard B. Polony (Substitute Appearance) (Polony, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
13 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Respondent CDK Global, LLC's Motion for Leave to Substitute Counsel12 is granted. This matter is set for an in-person status hearing for 5/14/2025 at 9:30 A.M. Mailed notice. (exr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
12 12 MOTION by Respondent CDK Global, LLC to substitute attorney (Talcott, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
11 11 Non-Agreed Statement re a Briefing Schedule for it's Motion to Compel Testimony and Production of Documents from Non-Party CDK Global LLC STATEMENT by Audi of America, Inc.(Singer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Jan 2025 Emails with A. Breland,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - March 2025 Emails with J. Flores
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
10 10 MINUTE entry before the Executive Committee: Case reassigned to the Honorable John F. Kness for all further proceedings pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 294(b). Mailed notice. (smb, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Reassignment
Friday, February 28, 2025
9 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent CDK Global, LLC by Brian James Talcott (Talcott, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
8 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Defendant Audi of America, Inc. regarding Audi of America, Inc's Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony and Production of Documents from Non-Party CDK Global, LLC Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 served on 1 on 02/25/25 (Glass, Murphy)
Related: [-]
7 7 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Audi of America, Inc. regarding miscellaneous case,,,1 re Audi of America Inc.'s Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony and Production of Documents from Non Party CDK Global LLC (Glass, Murphy)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 5). (cvk, )
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cvk, )
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 23, 2025
6 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Audi of America, Inc. by Murphy Olivia Glass (Glass, Murphy)
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Audi of America, Inc. by Owen H. Smith (Smith, Owen)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Audi of America, Inc. and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Singer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Audi of America, Inc. by Matthew F Singer (Singer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Singer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE by Audi of America, Inc. Audi of America, Inc's Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony and Production of Documents from Non-Party CDK Global, LLC Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 Filing fee $ 52, receipt number AILNDC-23119504.(Singer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Gustafson Deposition Transcript,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Document Subpoena,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition Subpoena,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - CDK Response letter to document subpoena,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - 2024.09.17 Email,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - CDK's Objections to Audi's Deposition Subpoena,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - 2024.09.17 Email from O. Glass,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - 2024.10.22 Letter to CDK,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - 2025.01.16 Email,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - 2024.08.30 Email
***Civil Case Terminated. (smb, )
Related: [-]