Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joshua P Searcy
Case #: 6:25-bk-60236
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 28, 2025
Claims Deadline:Jul 01, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC
207 E Charnwood St
Tyler, TX 75701-1738
Represented By
Robert C. Lane
The Lane Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702


Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
34 34 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/01 7:20 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC Related [+]. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-] 29 Interim Order Authorizing Debtor's Use Of Cash Collateral And Granting Adequate Protection And Related Relief (RE: related document(s)7 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Equity Bank, Dedicated Funding and other Unknown Creditors Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Budget # 2 Exhibit B - UCC Lien List # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC). Final Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2025 at 09:30 AM at Virtual Hearing Location (TYL May 13). (jd)
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
33 33 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/30 2:16 PM
Motion by (Attorney: Erika E. Mortensen) to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Freddy's, L.L.C. (Mortensen, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
32 32 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/30 2:11 PM
Motion by (Attorney: Benjamin C. Struby) to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Freddy's, L.L.C. (Struby, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
31 31 2 pgs order Order and Notice of Status Hearing Subchapter V (11 U.S.C. Sec. 1188) Wed 04/30 8:13 AM
Notice of Status Conference Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 1188. Virtual Hearing scheduled for 6/16/2025 at 09:00 AM at Virtual Hearing JSwebex. Debtor shall file a Pre-Hearing Report pursuant to 11 U.S.C Sec. 1188(c) by 6/2/2025. (jd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
30 30 misc Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 5:42 PM
Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Paul M. Lopez) Filed by COLLIN COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR/COLLECTOR (Lopez, Paul)
Related: [-]
29 29 12 pgs order Order and Notice of Hearing Tue 04/29 4:45 PM
Interim Order Authorizing Debtor's Use Of Cash Collateral And Granting Adequate Protection And Related Relief Related [+]. Final Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2025 at 09:30 AM at Virtual Hearing Location (TYL May 13). (jd)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Equity Bank, Dedicated Funding and other Unknown Creditors Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Budget # 2 Exhibit B - UCC Lien List # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC
Monday, April 28, 2025
28 28 misc Notice of Appearance Mon 04/28 2:32 PM
Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Diane W. Sanders) Filed by Victoria County (Sanders, Diane)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Notice of Appearance Mon 04/28 8:29 AM
Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: W. Steven Bryant) on behalf of Athens Burgers, LLC and Victoria Burgers, LLC Filed by Victoria Burgers, LLC, Athens Burgers, LLC (Bryant, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
26 26 misc Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 2:24 PM
Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: John K. Turner) Filed by Greenville ISD, Town of Prosper, Prosper ISD (Turner, John)
Related: [-]
court POrder Note Fri 04/25 2:30 PM
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
25 25 court Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/24 11:31 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Granting Request for Emergency Hearing (RE: related document(s)7 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Equity Bank, Dedicated Funding and other Unknown Creditors Filed by Debtor Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC). Virtual Hearing scheduled for 4/24/2025 at 09:30 AM at Virtual Hearing Location (TYL Apri 24). (jd)
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors Thu 04/24 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/28/2025 at 01:00 PM via Telephonic Dial-In Information at https://www.txeb.uscourts.gov/341info. Proofs of Claims due by 7/1/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/20/2025. (sr)
23 23 trustee Notice Appointing Trustee Thu 04/24 1:40 PM
Notice To Trustee Katharine Battaia Clark (SBRA V) Of Selection And Appointment With Trustee's Acceptance. Filed by US Trustee(Vardeman, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Katharine Battaia Clark
22 22 4 pgs misc Notice of Appearance Thu 04/24 9:55 AM
Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Stacy B. Loftin) Filed by Simmons Bank (Loftin, Stacy)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held (Evidentiary) Thu 04/24 10:15 AM
Evidentiary Hearing Held: Motion Granted On An Interim Basis. Agreed Order To Be Uploaded by Chip Lane. Court To Set Final Hearing. Order Due to be filed by: Chip Lane Related [+]. (jd)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Equity Bank, Dedicated Funding and other Unknown Creditors Filed by Debtor Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
21 21 misc Notice of Appearance Wed 04/23 2:32 PM
Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Julie Anne Parsons) Filed by The County of Henderson, Texas (Parsons, Julie)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Notice of Appearance Wed 04/23 2:15 PM
Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: COURTNEY HULL) Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts, Revenue Accounting Division (Hull, Courtney)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Notice of Appearance Wed 04/23 12:45 PM
Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Toby L. Gerber) /Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers Filed by Equity Bank (Gerber, Toby)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing Wed 04/23 10:02 AM
Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; and (3) the attorney will maintain the originally signed declaration for at least one year after final disposition of the case. Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC Related [+]. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-] 17 Amended Voluntary Petition. Amendment:add the dba Freddy's Frozen Custard & Steakburgers Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC (RE: related document(s)1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC, Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/21/2025.Document Due 04/29/2025. filed by Debtor Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC). Document Due 04/30/2025. filed by Debtor Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC
17 17 misc Amended Voluntary Petition Wed 04/23 9:56 AM
Amended Voluntary Petition. Amendment:add the dba Freddy's Frozen Custard & Steakburgers Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC Related [+]. Document Due 04/30/2025. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC, Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/21/2025.Document Due 04/29/2025. filed by Debtor Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC
16 16 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing Wed 04/23 9:22 AM
Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; and (3) the attorney will maintain the originally signed declaration for at least one year after final disposition of the case. Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC Related [+]. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC, Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/21/2025.Document Due 04/29/2025. filed by Debtor Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC
15 15 5 pgs misc Exhibit and/or Witness List Wed 04/23 7:06 AM
Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC Related [+]. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Equity Bank, Dedicated Funding and other Unknown Creditors Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Budget # 2 Exhibit B - UCC Lien List # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit 1 - Budget
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - UCC Lien list
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
14 14 misc Exhibit and/or Witness List Wed 04/23 7:05 AM
Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC Related [+]. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Equity Bank, Dedicated Funding and other Unknown Creditors Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Budget # 2 Exhibit B - UCC Lien List # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/22 4:32 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC Related [+]. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-] 12 Order Granting Request for Emergency Hearing (RE: related document(s)7 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Equity Bank, Dedicated Funding and other Unknown Creditors Filed by Debtor Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC). Virtual Hearing scheduled for 4/24/2025 at 09:30 AM at Virtual Hearing Location (TYL Apri 24). (jd)
12 12 order Emergency Hearing Tue 04/22 4:09 PM
Order Granting Request for Emergency Hearing Related [+]. Virtual Hearing scheduled for 4/24/2025 at 09:30 AM at Virtual Hearing Location (TYL Apri 24). (jd)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Equity Bank, Dedicated Funding and other Unknown Creditors Filed by Debtor Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC
11 11 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Tue 04/22 3:28 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/28/2025 at 01:00 PM via Telephonic Dial-In Information at https://www.txeb.uscourts.gov/341info. Proofs of Claims due by 7/1/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/20/2025. (sr)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Generic Motion Tue 04/22 3:09 PM
Motion FOR APPROVAL OF POST-PETITION MONTHLY RETAINER PAYMENTS Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 9 pgs motion Employ Tue 04/22 3:06 PM
Application to Employ The Lane Law Firm, PLLC as Debtor's Attorney Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Declaration
Att: 3 Proposed Order
8 8 motion Emergency Hearing (Request For Hearing Within 7 Days or Less) Tue 04/22 2:47 PM
Request for Emergency Hearing On Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC Related [+]. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Equity Bank, Dedicated Funding and other Unknown Creditors filed by Debtor Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC
Att: 1 Declaration
Att: 2 Proposed Order
7 7 8 pgs motion Cash Collateral (Authority To Use) Tue 04/22 2:41 PM
Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Equity Bank, Dedicated Funding and other Unknown Creditors Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Budget
Att: 2 Exhibit B - UCC Lien List
Att: 3 Proposed Order
6 6 misc Equity Security Holders (List of) Tue 04/22 2:29 PM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Tax Documents (Federal Tax Returns) Tue 04/22 2:29 PM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2023 Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement of Operations for Small Business Debtor (CHAPTER 11) Tue 04/22 2:28 PM
Statement of Operations for Small Business Debtor for Filing Period 2025 Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Cash Flow Statement Tue 04/22 2:27 PM
Cash Flow Statement for Small Business Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Balance Sheet Tue 04/22 2:27 PM
Balance Sheet Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 70 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/22 2:15 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC, Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/21/2025.Document Due 04/29/2025.(Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
misc Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Tue 04/22 2:16 PM
Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Filed by Outlaw Steakburgers, LLC Document Due 04/29/2025. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Tue 04/22 2:18 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-60236 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A13883527, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]