Consolidated
Lead case: 3:25-md-03149

California Southern District Court
Judge:Roger T Benitez
Referred: Michael S Berg
Case #: 3:25-cv-00972
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332ds Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Case in other court:California Eastern, 2:25-cv-00206
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 2:09 PM PDT
Defendant
PowerSchool Group, LLC
Represented By
Anne Johnson Palmer
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dale Griffin
Represented By
Kristen Lake Cardoso
Kopelowitz Ostrow P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
14 14 misc Electronic Transfer In Tue 04/22 12:28 PM
Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg assigned to transfer case from Eastern District of California. (no document attached) (rmc)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Case Transferred In - District Transfer (Electronic Transfers Only) Tue 04/22 12:22 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:25-cv-00206. Original file received electronically (rmc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
12 12 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of California. Electronic Records Sent. MDL Case No. 3149. CASE CLOSED. (Deputy Clerk RMG) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
11 11 ORDER RELATING CASES signed by District Judge Dena M. Coggins on 04/08/25 RELATING cases 2:25-cv-00093-DC-AC, 2:25-cv-00096-CSK, 2:25-cv-00098-DC-SCR, 2:25-cv-00110-SCR, 2:25-cv-00136-SCR, 2:25-cv-00139-CKD, 2:25-cv-00140-DC-CSK, 2:25-cv-00141-DAD-CSK, 2:25-cv-00152-DC-SCR, 2:25-cv-00159-DAD-AC, 2:25-cv-00165-DC-JDP, 2:25-cv-00171-JDP, 2:25-cv-00173-DAD-SCR, 2:25-cv-00203-DC-SCR, 2:25-cv-00204-DAD-JDP, 2:25-cv-00206-CKD, 2:25-cv-00207-DAD-CSK, 2:25-cv-00208-CKD, 2:25-cv-00209-AC, 2:25-cv-00210-WBS-AC, 2:25-cv-00211-SCR, 2:25-cv-00230-DC-JDP, 2:25-cv-00231-DJC-AC, 2:25-cv-00232-DJC-CSK, 2:25-cv-00252-DJC-JDP, 2:25-cv-00256-DC-JDP, 2:25-cv-00259-JDP, 2:25-cv-00271-AC,. 2:25-cv-00310-DJC-CSK, 2:25-cv-00393-DJC-JDP, 2:25-cv-00410-JDP, 2:25-cv-00426-DJC-CSK, 2:25-cv-00427-SCR, 2:25-cv-00431-CKD, 2:25-cv-00444-WBS-AC, 2:25-cv-00485-TLN-CKD, 2:25-cv-00498-AC, 2:25-cv-00514-CSK, 2:25-cv-00517-AC, 2:25-cv-00519-DC-JDP, 2:25-cv-00709-SCR. This related case is REASSIGNED to District Judge Dena M. Coggins and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for all further proceedings Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:25-cv-0206 DC AC. (Deputy Clerk VLC) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
10 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/18/2025 GRANTING7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. (Deputy Clerk RRB) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
9 9 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to PowerSchool Group LLC on 3/14/2025, Answer due 5/13/2025 (Cardoso, Kristen) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
8 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant PowerSchool Group LLC. (Johnson Palmer, Anne) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
7 7 JOINT MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to FILE ANSWER by PowerSchool Group LLC. Attorney Johnson Palmer, Anne added.(Johnson Palmer, Anne) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - MDL Motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - MDL Second Amended Schedule of Actions,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, February 21, 2025
6 6 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:25-cv-00517-AC by Megan Joseph, Dale Kidder, Emily Kidder. Attorney Saveri, Joseph R. added. (Saveri, Joseph) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
5 5 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:25-cv-00252-DJC-JDP, 2:25-cv-00259-JDP, 2:25-cv-00256-JDP, 2:25-cv-00271-AC by Sheilah Buack-Shelton, S. S.. (LaComb, Tim) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
4 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:25-cv-00093-JAM-AC, 2:25-cv-00171-JDP, 2:25-cv-00165-DC-JDP, 2:25-cv-00211-SCR, 2:25-cv-00203-DC-SCR, 2:25-cv-00208-CKD, 2:25-cv-00209-AC, 2:25-cv-00210-WBS-AC, 2:25-cv-00207-DAD-CSK, 2:25-cv-00211-SCR by Sheilah Buack-Shelton, S. S.. Attorney LaComb, Tim added.(LaComb, Tim) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
3 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Deputy Clerk OML) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
2 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *PowerSchool Group, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kristen Lake Cardoso* *Kopelowitz Ostrow P.A.* *One West Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 500* *Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301*. (Deputy Clerk OML) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Powerschool Group LLC by Dale Griffin. Attorney Cardoso, Kristen Lake added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11976734) (Cardoso, Kristen) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet