Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John Antoon II
Referred: Daniel C Irick
Case #: 6:25-cv-00699
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Terminated:May 09, 2025
Case in other court:Orange County Circuit Court, 2025-CA-2398
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 5:09 PM EDT
Defendant
Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Plaintiff
Emory F Harden


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
20 20 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 05/09 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RPB)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/09 4:18 PM
ORDER dismissing case in light of 18 Notice of Settlement and directing the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/9/2025. (EK)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of settlement Fri 05/09 11:35 AM
NOTICE of settlement by Emory F Harden (Anderson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
17 17 order Standing Order Tue 05/06 9:23 AM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
16 16 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Fri 04/25 11:04 AM
Amended DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Zavala, Luis) Modified text on 4/25/2025 (SPM)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Interested Persons Order Fri 04/25 10:02 AM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 7 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed or if no other deadlines are in place by another order) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/25/2025. (KLD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 04/24 9:49 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Related case(s): No (Zavala, Luis)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 04/24 9:29 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Emory F Harden. Related case(s): No (Anderson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/23 4:54 PM
ORDER that Defendant shall file an amended disclosure statement no later than April 30, 2025. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/23/2025. (EK)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Wed 04/23 4:43 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Emory F Harden. (Anderson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/23 4:35 PM
**COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT** NOTICE by Emory F Harden Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Anderson, Daniel) Modified on 4/24/2025 as to docket text (ARL)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/23 4:30 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Emory F Harden. (Anderson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 04/23 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Daniel Graham Anderson on behalf of Emory F Harden. Lead Counsel: D. Graham Anderson. (Anderson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/23 12:31 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:25-cv-699-JA-DCI. (ARL)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/23 10:42 AM
NOTICE by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America Defendant's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a) (Zavala, Luis)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/23 10:38 AM
***INCORRECT EVENT CODE, COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE AS NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION*** NOTICE by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Zavala, Luis) Modified on 4/24/2025 (LD)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 04/23 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Luis F Zavala on behalf of Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Lead Counsel: Luis F. Zavala, Esq.. (Zavala, Luis)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Wed 04/23 10:31 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Zavala, Luis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/23 10:27 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Zavala, Luis)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 04/23 10:13 AM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Orange County, FL, case number 2025-CA-002398 filed in State Court on 4/17/2025. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-23277585 filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Zavala, Luis) Modified on 4/23/2025 as to docket text (ARL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 State Court ANSWER,
Att: 3 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 4 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit