Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:James R Knepp II
Referred: Darrell A Clay
Case #: 3:25-cv-00814
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Fri 04/25 12:33 PM
Order granting Plaintiff's7 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Justin M. Goldstein for Mindy Nichole Kimmet. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Court records show that between 2020 and the present, Mr. Goldstein has appeared in 71 cases in this District, each time requesting permission to appear pro hac vice. He currently has 29 cases pending in this District. Local Civil Rule 83.5 expresses this Court's "strong preference" for attorneys to seek permanent admission to the Bar of this Court. Given Mr. Goldstein's ongoing and substantial practice in this District, permanent admission to the Bar of the Northern District of Ohio is strongly suggested. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 4/25/2025.(R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/24 9:37 PM
Motion for attorney Justin Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-13067823, filed by Plaintiff Mindy Nichole Kimmet.(Goldstein, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy Wed 04/23 3:14 PM
Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Magistrate Judges Initial Order Wed 04/23 3:14 PM
Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant is granted a maximum of 60 calendar days after notice of the complaint is served on it to file the certified transcript of the administrative record. Plaintiff must file its Brief on the Merits within 45 calendar days of the filing of the Administrative Transcript. If Plaintiff's Brief on the Merits is not filed within 45 calendar days after the Administrative Transcript, the case may be subject to dismissal for want of prosecution without further notice. Defendant's Brief on the Merits must be filed within 45 calendar days thereafter. Plaintiff's Reply Brief, if any, shall be filed within 14 days of filing of Defendant's Brief. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 4/23/2025. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis Wed 04/23 3:13 PM
Order granting Plaintiff's2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 4/23/2025.(R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 order Administrative Track DCM Initial Order Tue 04/22 4:01 PM
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Sara Lioi on 4/22/2025. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/22 3:33 PM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Mindy Nichole Kimmet. (Goldstein, Justin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 3:33 PM
Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Mindy Nichole Kimmet. (Goldstein, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Unfavorable Decision,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Notice of Appeals Council Action,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 04/22 3:59 PM
Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 04/22 3:59 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice of Social Security Complaint Tue 04/22 4:00 PM
Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
order Automatic Reference of Administrative Action Tue 04/22 4:04 PM
Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge James R. Knepp II on 4/22/2025. (K,AR)
Related: [-]