South Carolina District Court
Judge:Mary Gordon Baker
Referred: Mary Gordon Baker
Case #: 2:25-cv-03370
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Consent Wed 04/23 4:26 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker. Signed by Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. on 4/23/2025. (tsim, )
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/23 2:09 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 04/23/2025.(kman, Kendall)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 04/23 11:23 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Tatum Peniston Toney.. (Clardy, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
6 6 order Order Tue 04/22 3:49 PM
TEXT ORDER: Directing the parties' attention to the Court's Standing Order on All 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) Social Security Disability Appeals Assigned to Judge Donald C. Coggins, Jr., located on the District Court's website. Within 30 days of the date of this Text Order, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file either a (1) signed and completed Notice, Consent, and Reference of Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, or (2) status report informing the Court that Plaintiff does not consent to disposition of this action by Magistrate Judge. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. on 4/22/2025. (tsim, )
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Set Answer Deadline - Social Security Complaint Tue 04/22 3:31 PM
Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. Set Answer Deadline - Social Security Complaint: Answer due from Commissioner of Social Security Administration on 6/23/2025. (tsim, )
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/22 3:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Related [+] by Tatum Peniston Toney. Response to Motion due by 5/6/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker. (tsim, )
Related: [-] stricted Access
1 1 cmp Complaint - Social Security Cases Only Tue 04/22 2:53 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Tatum Peniston Toney. Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.03 regarding Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website. (tsim, ). Modified on 4/22/2025 to add additional attachment. (tsim, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/22/2025) Supporting Documents-Fee Agreement