Texas Northern District Court
Judge:James Wesley Hendrix
Referred: John R Parker
Case #: 1:25-cv-00064
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:2410 Quiet Title
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 4:09 PM CDT
Defendant
ERIXMILL PEREZ
716 Hillside Drive
Big Spring, TX 79720
Defendant
LUZ RIVERA
716 Hillside Drive
Big Spring, TX 79720
Defendant
United States of America, on behalf of The Secretary of Housing and Urban Development
Plaintiff
Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By
Sammy Hooda
Marinosci Law Group PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
6 6 4 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Fri 04/25 2:14 PM
ORDER TO SHOW JURISDICTION. The Court ORDERS Lakeview to file no later than May 12, 2025, a written response to this Order demonstrating that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this lawsuit. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 4/25/2025) (skh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 04/23 9:42 AM
Summons issued as to United States of America, on behalf of The Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (amg)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/23 9:41 AM
Summons Issued as to Erixmill Perez, Luz Rivera. (amg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 qcref Hendrix Tue 04/22 4:38 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Parker (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (amg)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 04/22 3:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Hooda, Sammy)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15443137) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hooda, Sammy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Note,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Deed of Trust TBF,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Assignment,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 4 - Loan Modification,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 5 - Demand Letters,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 6 - HUD Deed of Trust,
Att: 7 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet